UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 201622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity helps people of all ages who need financial support due to "poverty, hardship or distress". The charity has limited funds and is only able to give out small grant to successful applicants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £3,499
Total expenditure: £2,100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 January 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • YATTON UNITED CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAURICE DAVID CROSSMAN Chair
None on record
Steven John Hu Trustee 01 December 2023
None on record
Steven James Lister Trustee 01 December 2023
JOHN LANE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Graham Humphreys Trustee 18 July 2019
JOHN LANE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Nigel Thomas Trustee 17 September 2018
JOHN LANE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WENDY GRIGGS Trustee
YATTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
JOHN LANE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
YATTON UNDENOMINATIONAL SCHOOL (RICHARD DURBAN'S CHARITY)
Received: On time
BRENDA ANNICE HAYWARD Trustee
JOHN LANE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARIANNE A PITMAN Trustee
JOHN LANE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
YATTON LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £2.22k £2.26k £6.67k £3.55k £3.50k
Total expenditure £2.64k £2.92k £2.98k £3.69k £2.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 18 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 31 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 29 SEPTEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF YATTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF YATTON
Registration history
  • 08 January 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
C/O Yatton Parish Council
Hangstones Pavillion
Stowey Road
Yatton
Bristol
BS49 4HS
Phone:
07912 890467
Website:

No information available