THE THOMAS STAFFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 201628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Michael Nelsey Trustee 20 June 2018
ST MARYS TRUST Received: On time
Chris Williams Trustee 28 February 2018 None on record
Andrew Ridgway Trustee 01 June 2014 None on record
Paul David Randall Trustee 29 June 2017
ST MARYS TRUST Received: On time
Rev Sharon Grenham-Thompson Chair 29 November 2016
ST MARYS TRUST Received: On time
PATRICIA MARIE MORRIS Trustee None on record
DAVID NICHOLAS Trustee 28 February 2018
Five Trees Community Trust Received: On time
Michele Chapman Trustee 18 May 2015 None on record