Accounts and annual returns THE CAMBRIDGESHIRE SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED

Charity number: 201640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window