Accounts and annual returns THE COLLEGE OF MATRONS

Charity number: 201720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window