Financial history THE COLLEGE OF MATRONS

Charity number: 201720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £195.82k £200.87k £201.04k £206.14k £212.14k
Total expenditure £164.22k £208.54k £205.65k £277.23k £327.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A