THE VICTORIA HALL

Charity number: 201731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £9.64k £10.34k £11.56k £12.48k £12.59k
Total expenditure £9.03k £5.94k £6.56k £10.76k £9.85k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A