THE VICTORIA HALL

Charity number: 201731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joan Collings Trustee 30 January 2018 None on record
RICHARD JOHN LEFROY PARDOE Chair 18 September 2019 None on record
Rachel Martin Trustee 21 August 2021 None on record
KENNETH JOHN COULSON Trustee 01 November 2016 None on record
JACQUELINE HELEN PRIOR Trustee 04 April 2016
SHALDON THEATRE COMPANY Recently registered
Andrew Peter Swinbank Trustee 24 July 2021
SHALDON THEATRE COMPANY Recently registered