Accounts and annual returns MRS JANE LEESON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 201789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 03 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 09 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required