ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 201885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FELICITY HORTON Trustee None on record
KAREN ALDWORTH Trustee 28 April 2012 None on record
Katie Moore Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
GILLIAN PILE Trustee None on record
Paul Ronald Oatway Trustee 17 May 2016 None on record
DEBRA PETERS Trustee 28 April 2012 None on record
RICHARD WYATT Chair 29 October 2011 None on record
Vicky Louise Whatmore Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
MARGARET ANNE BOWDITCH Trustee 28 April 2012 None on record