Trustees ST LAWRENCE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 201922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doreen Hippsley | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Teresa May Jessop | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jefferies | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Majella Jefferies | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Cleveley | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelvin Handscomb | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Adams | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Paul Ward | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Harrison | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Humfrey Gaskell Twining LVO OBE DL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.