CHURCH LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 201956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.16k £6.74k £9.27k £7.94k £6.84k
Total expenditure £2.66k £3.99k £2.63k £770 £1.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A