Accounts and annual returns CHURCH LANDS
Charity number: 201971

Charity reporting is up to date (205 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2023 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2023 | 205 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2022 | 507 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2022 | 507 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 07 April 2021 | 524 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 07 April 2021 | 524 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 07 April 2021 | 889 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 07 April 2021 | 889 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window