Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM HOWARD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 201991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required