Financial history WILLIAM HOWARD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 201991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £383 £381 £341 £228 £315
Total expenditure £250 £500 £510 £0 £1.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A