TITCHMARSH CLUB ROOM

Charity number: 202080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 March 2020 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time Download