THE JULIA COUSINS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 202099
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED IN THE PRINCIPAL REGISTRY 7TH JUNE 1890 AND SCHEMES OF THE 9TH FEBRUARY 1912 AND 9TH AUGUST 1971.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF AGED INDIGENT RESPECTABEL SINGLE WOMEN OF THE PARISHES OF EAST AND WEST TEIGNMOUTH OF NOT LESS THAN 50 YEARS OF AGE AND WHO FROM ANY OTHER SOURCE HAVE NOT MORE THAN $312 PER ANNUM OR SUCH OTHER AMOUNT AS THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS APPROVE FROM TIME TO TIME AND WHO WERE BORN IN TEIGNMOUTH OR AT LEAST ONE OF WHOSE PARENTS WERE RESPECTIVELY SO BORN.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 20 February 1962 : registered
  • 09 September 2018 : removed (DOES NOT OPERATE)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helped
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helped
  • Other Charitable Activities