SALISBURY CITY ALMSHOUSE AND WELFARE CHARITIES

Charity number: 202110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 24 December 2018 10 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 December 2018 10 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 24 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 24 December 2016 10 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 December 2016 10 July 2017 On time Download