SALISBURY CITY ALMSHOUSE AND WELFARE CHARITIES

Charity number: 202110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 24/12/2016 24/12/2017 24/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.15m £2.99m £1.84m £1.94m £1.83m
Total expenditure £1.48m £1.47m £1.63m £1.59m £1.65m
Income from government contracts £69.88k £74.02k £72.59k £73.94k £71.99k
Income from government grants £67.29k £67.29k £67.29k £67.29k £67.29k
Income - Donations and legacies £419.24k £1.40m £40.43k £27.68k £1.84k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.35m £1.37m £1.40m £1.47m £1.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £420.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £335.90k £346.84k £366.93k £387.01k £323.04k
Income - Other £39.61k £293.92k £37.74k £50.88k £21.63k
Income - Legacies £419.24k £983.47k £40.43k £3.58k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.45m £1.44m £1.61m £1.56m £1.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £27.80k £26.49k £19.56k £24.36k £28.21k
Expenditure - Governance £24.83k £25.30k £29.48k £29.65k £25.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £9.21k £11.07k £9.96k £2.96k £3.24k
Expenditure - Investment management £27.80k £26.49k £19.56k £21.25k £15.73k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0