TAUNTON HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 202120
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 2 OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 2 FEBRUARY 2006, AND TRUSTEES RESOLUTION 13.3.6 AND 19 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
1) A YEARLY SUM OF ·100 OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE COMMISSIONERS FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE TO THE TRUSTEES FOR THE TIME BEING OF BISHOP FOX'S SCHOOL, TAUNTON. 2) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OVER 60 YEARS OF AGE.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 02 October 1981 : registered
  • 20 March 2019 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (INCOR))
Other names
  • TAUNTON TOWN CHARITY (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services