Accounts and annual returns CHURCH LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 202194
Charity reporting is overdue by 1679 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 218 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 218 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 583 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 583 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 948 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 948 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1314 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1314 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1679 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1679 days