OXFORD ST GILES SUSAN KIDD CHARITY

Charity number: 202199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.85k £1.60k £1.55k £1.67k £1.79k
Total expenditure £1.56k £1.57k £1.55k £1.65k £1.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A