LYDFORD CHURCH COTTAGE TRUST

Charity number: 202248
Removed charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED AUGUST 11TH 1913. UNREP.VOL. 178 P400. SCHEME OF CHARITY COMMISSIONERS 8/4/1965 AS AMENDED 17 JUNE 1997 BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION OF GIFT COAL TO POOR WIDOWS AT CHRISTMAS RESIDING IN THE EXXLESIASTICL PARISH OF ST. PETROCK, LYDFORD. IF AND SO FAR AS THE TRUSTEES CANNOT APPLY THE INCOME IN ABOVE MANNER THEY SHALL APPLY INCOME AS THEY THINK FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF EITHER THE POOR OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH GENERALLY OR OF SUCH POOR PERSONS RESIDENT THEREIN AS THEY SELECT IN THEIR IN CASH OR KIND.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 05 May 1965 : registered
  • 23 January 1998 : removed (FUNDS SPENT UP (S.75))
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
    No information available
Who the charity helped
    No information available
How the charity helped
    No information available