ISAAC AND ANNIE FOGELMAN RELIEF TRUST

Charity number: 202285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £10.87k £17.37k £13.77k £14.30k £20.90k
Total expenditure £7.14k £9.89k £3.67k £6.49k £7.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A