THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)

Charity number: 202286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 27 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 29 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 01 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 01 February 2017 On time Download