Financial history THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)

Charity number: 202286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £81.88k £81.70k £82.48k £83.09k £63.35k
Total expenditure £91.74k £65.59k £70.83k £105.51k £63.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A