ST MARY'S SHENLEY, CHURCHYARD TRUST

Charity number: 202330
Removed charity
Governing document
ú200 LEGACY BEQUEATHED BY WILL OF THE REV. J.R. VINCENT WHO DIED 15 APRIL 1950 AND TRUST DEED DATED 30 OCTOBER 1950 AND BEQUEST OF RT. REV. T. JENKIN'S DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 1947.
Charitable objects
UPKEEP OF THE CHURCHYARD AT ST MARY'S, SHENLEY.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 12 January 1962 : registered
  • 21 May 2018 : removed (AMALGAMATED)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helped
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Other Charitable Activities