THE POUND GREEN AND BUTTON-OAK COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 202336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide sevices and active facilities including a place of central focus and any communial activity for the benefit of the local Community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £3,235
Total expenditure: £6,059

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rodney Crawford Chair 05 May 2016
None on record
Michael Pugh Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Amber Walley Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Jason Peckham Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
David Slade Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Angela Mills Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Rita Hall Trustee 19 March 2018
None on record
GAIL TWEEDALE Trustee 19 March 2018
None on record
Louise Aston Trustee 19 March 2018
None on record
Colin Amor Trustee 19 March 2018
None on record
Jackie Wickham Trustee 19 March 2018
THE WYRE FOREST SOCIETY
Received: On time
Val Gardner Trustee 19 March 2018
None on record
JOHN TWEEDALE Trustee 19 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £6.31k £18.91k £12.60k £5.60k £3.24k
Total expenditure £5.01k £8.72k £7.73k £4.59k £6.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.10k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 08 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 17 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DREAMSKERRY
POUND GREEN
ARLEY
BEWDLEY
DY12 3LB
Phone:
01299404172
Website:

No information available