Financial history ASHBURTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 202413
Charity reporting is overdue by 339 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.49k £1.44k £1.56k £1.25k £1.58k
Total expenditure £365 £150 £0 £300 £600
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A