MOBBS MEMORIAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 202478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 October 2017 On time Download