Accounts and annual returns THOMAS PEACHEY'S CHARITY

Charity number: 202480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 September 2022 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 September 2022 675 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 September 2022 1041 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1679 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1679 days