THE HUNTINGDONSHIRE SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 202573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £155.17k £160.42k £213.64k £153.44k £171.28k
Total expenditure £146.59k £188.61k £139.95k £142.29k £135.55k
Income from government contracts £33.00k £33.00k £33.00k N/A £33.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £33.00k £33.00k £33.00k