CROXTON REST HOMES

Charity number: 202640
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £600 £600 £600 £2.28k £17.72k
Total expenditure £352 £394 £384 £409 £12.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A