THE ELGAR BIRTHPLACE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve the Birthplace Cottage in which Elgar was born, together with the archive and memorabilia therein, and to present the same in an attractive format for the enjoyment by, and education of, the visiting public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 04 April 1962: Standard registration
- THE ELGAR BIRTHPLACE MUSEUM (Working name)
- ELGAR MEMORIAL BIRTHPLACE FUND (OR SHORTLY ELGAR BIRTHPLACE TRUST) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE ELGAR FOUNDATION | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEEDS 4TH AUGUST 1936 AND 1ST JULY 1955. AS AMENDED BY THE SCHEME DATED 1 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE BIRTHPLACE OF SIR EDWARD ELGAR DECEASED AS A MEMORIAL AND A MUSEUM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Richards Sandy Partnership Ltd
Thorneloe HOUSE
25 Barbourne Road
WORCESTER
WR1 1RU
- Phone:
- 01905612822
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window