THOMAS AXE'S NON-ECCLESIASTICAL

Charity number: 202725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.13k £2.24k £1.05k £1.77k £2.11k
Total expenditure £1.93k £2.06k £2.24k £1.63k £1.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A