THE BAMPTON WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 202735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.08k £8.52k £9.29k £9.38k £13.15k
Total expenditure £8.45k £10.37k £10.68k £8.07k £12.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A