Trustees HOSPITAL OF ST CROSS AND ALMSHOUSE OF NOBLE POVERTY
Charity number: 202751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Cooke | Chair | 15 June 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Councillor Angela Clear | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Sir Jonathan Portal | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Rev Dominik Chmielewski | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Imogen Lyndon Skeggs | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Adam Rattray | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Dr Timothy Robert Foster | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Felicity Ann Pennycook | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Michael Sedley Killingley | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Cllr Fiona Marion Mcmillan Mather | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
MRS GILL BECK | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
The Very Reverend Catherine Ogle | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||
KATHERINE YVONNE WAKE | Trustee | 02 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL HIGGINS | Trustee | 19 June 2012 |
|
|||||||||||||||
MR WILLIAM CORBETT | Trustee | 21 September 2010 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Master and Brethren of the Hospital of St Cross | Trustee | 01 January 1950 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.