THE CHEDWORTH VILLAGE TRUST LTD

Charity Number: 202774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to Chedworth village organisations - mainly St Andrews School, The Village Hall and St Andrews Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,814
Total expenditure: £938

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD ISAAC Chair
None on record
Lucy Elizabeth Hatherell Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
Kenneth Paul Minshull Trustee 27 February 2018
None on record
Alice Sinton Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
Matthew Fulford Trustee 12 August 2014
None on record
ROBERT YOUNG Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.12k £6.22k £6.33k £6.53k £6.81k
Total expenditure £3.87k £5.00k £3.70k £12.50k £938
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Highlaines House
Middle Chedworth
Chedworth
Cheltenham
GL54 4AJ
Phone:
01285720401
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available