ROBERT BARKER OR THE BRIDGE HOUSE TRUST (ESTATE TRUSTEES)

Charity number: 202808
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Darcy Chesterfield-Terry Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record
TINA KILLICK Trustee 16 April 2013
THE BRIDGE HOUSE TRUST - NON-ECCLESIASTICAL Received: 2 days late
ADRIAN NEEDHAM Trustee 14 October 2011
THE BRIDGE HOUSE TRUST - NON-ECCLESIASTICAL Received: 2 days late
MARCENA DENISE HILL Trustee
ROBERT BARKER OR THE BRIDGE HOUSE TRUST (CHURCH BRANCH) Received: On time
ALLEN JOHN CORCORAN Trustee 07 January 2022 None on record
SANDRA NEEDHAM Trustee None on record
MICHAEL PENROSE EDWARDS Trustee 07 January 2022
ROBERT BARKER OR THE BRIDGE HOUSE TRUST (CHURCH BRANCH) Received: On time
HARRY CLASPER Chair
THE BRIDGE HOUSE TRUST - NON-ECCLESIASTICAL Received: 2 days late
Elaine Eastman Trustee 07 October 2014 None on record