Accounts and annual returns CHURCH AND POOR'S LAND

Charity number: 202822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required