Accounts and annual returns GRENDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 202917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 January 2020 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 December 2018 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required