OXFAM

Charity number: 202918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kenneth Mathieson Caldwell Trustee 07 November 2016
BRAC UK Received: On time
LOIS ALYSON JACOBS Trustee 07 October 2016 None on record
Anne Alexandra Hudson Trustee 31 January 2020 None on record
Nana Asantewa Afadzinu Trustee 31 January 2020 None on record
Charles Mark Gurassa Chair 07 October 2020 None on record
Mohammed Wakkas Khan Trustee 02 October 2015
MANCHESTER HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS Received: On time
Leslie Gordon Campbell Trustee 06 December 2018 None on record
ANGELA CLUFF Trustee 06 October 2017 None on record
BABATUNDE TAIWO OLANREWAJU Trustee 06 October 2017
THE TONY BLAIR GOVERNANCE INITIATIVE Received: On time
Andrew Fleming Hind Trustee 04 December 2019 None on record
Nicholas Drew CHEESEMAN Trustee 06 October 2017 None on record