Financial history THE CHARITY OF ROBERT HUGO MONTAGU BAKER FOR WOLBOROUGH AND NEWTON

Charity number: 203001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £278 £230 £2.12k £253 £315
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A