Accounts and annual returns THE ANTIENT SOCIETY OF ST STEPHENS RINGERS

Charity number: 203169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 03 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 07 August 2020 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 07 August 2020 99 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 18 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 18 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 26 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window