Trustees TOLLER PORCORUM VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 203182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ennals | Chair | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Johnson | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Feaver | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hammonds | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM RAWLING | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christine Frances Burt | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE GAIL WOODFORD | Trustee | 30 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK JOHN GASCOYNE WOODFORD | Trustee | 30 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH ENNALS | Trustee | 30 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS JUDY MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH MARY BILLEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THELMA DAWN BILLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.