PURTON INSTITUTE AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 203202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £45.81k £52.41k £50.28k £61.83k £48.84k
Total expenditure £41.26k £55.86k £49.70k £47.98k £33.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.00k £15.04k £12.96k £10.00k £30.53k