Accounts and annual returns THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN TRUST NO 1439 ST ANDREW THE WESTLANDS

Charity number: 203230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required