NICHOLAS WATTS' GIFT

Charity number: 203271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To distribute income arising from the Estate of Mr N Watts in accordance with the terms of the decesased's Will and Scheme set up in 1985.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £28,561
Total expenditure: £4,625

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BROWNSDON AND TREMAYNE ESTATE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DUNCAN JOHN BIRD Chair
None on record
Robin Alan Derges Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
David Allen Turner Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Colin John Edwards Trustee 26 September 2017
None on record
Terence George Pearce Trustee 29 September 2015
None on record
Keith Nicholas Williams Trustee 29 September 2015
None on record
Gerald William Venning Trustee 29 September 2015
None on record
RODNEY FRANCIS GLANVILLE Trustee 23 September 2014
SKRUM
Received: On time
Henry James Sanders Trustee 19 February 2014
None on record
George Henry James Medland Trustee 19 February 2014
None on record
Albert John Downing Trustee 19 February 2014
Bedford Lodge 282
Received: On time
RUSSELL GEORGE WOOLCOCK Trustee
None on record
STEPHEN HENRY CHARLES CARR Trustee
None on record
JOHN COLLACOTT Trustee
None on record
JOHN GREENING Trustee
None on record
DENNIS EDWARD GREENING Trustee
None on record
DENNIS MAURICE CARR Trustee
THE MARSHALL AND BROWNE MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
ROGER DAVID ARCHER BIRD Trustee
ABBEY CHAPEL
Received: On time
WALTER LAKE Trustee
THE MARSHALL AND BROWNE MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £23.98k £25.63k £26.53k £27.37k £28.56k
Total expenditure £9.62k £15.84k £13.83k £11.50k £4.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 28 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 28 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 29 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 29 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 09 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 09 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 13 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL OF 17 FEBRUARY 1674
Charitable objects
FOR BENEFIT OF 5 GODLY AND RELIGIOUS MEN WITHIN COUNTY OF DEVON AND FOR HONEST AND RELIGIOUS TRADESMEN OF TOWN AND PARISH OF TAVISTOCK.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF TAVISTOCK AND COUNTY OF DEVON
Registration history
  • 11 May 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Hardstone Bungalow
Dunterton
TAVISTOCK
Devon
PL19 0Qj
Phone:
07742 444003
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available