PORTSMOUTH FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 203323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 11 September 2020 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 22 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 03 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 May 2017 On time Download