Financial history WILLIAM TURNER'S CHARITY

Charity number: 203343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £481 £492 £504 £512 £522
Total expenditure £50 £250 £550 £0 £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A