Financial history JOHN BECK'S AND LEWIS FETTO'S CHARITY

Charity number: 203344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.41k £1.44k £1.45k £1.68k £2.08k
Total expenditure £1.21k £1.09k £840 £1.93k £1.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A